Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Moncada

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
14 Dec 162040.9AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
3 Mar 162141.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
31 Dec 162141.9DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Moncada
Bishop Pedro Moncada (born 1580, died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,849
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 139, Number 888
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018