Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Dimas Lloris

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jun 1572AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
4 Jul 1576AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
8 Aug 1598DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Dimas Lloris
Bishop Juan Dimas Lloris (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGandesa, Diocese of Tortosa

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 83, Number 501
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 324, and Page 129
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,572, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast