Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Sans y Códol

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1547BornPuigcerdá
1575¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 159446.7AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
9 Apr 159547.3Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
20 Aug 161264.6AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
23 Feb 162072.1DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Sans y Códol:
Bishop Luis Sans y Códol (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,843
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 144, and Page 110
  • bd/bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 107, Number 681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015