Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Rovirola

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553¹BornVich
3 Nov 157724.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 160451.1AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
2 May 160451.3Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
12 Oct 160956.7DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Rovirola:
Bishop Rafael Rovirola (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,846
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 119, Number 759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015