Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Nieto y Corrales Montero Nieto, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1559BornOrgaz
17 Apr 160647.3AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
8 Sep 160647.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
12 Aug 161354.6AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
25 Oct 162162.8AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
1625¹66.0AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
1626¹67.0DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Nieto y Corrales Montero Nieto:
Archbishop Lorenzo Nieto y Corrales Montero Nieto O.S.B. Archbishop of Cagliari

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 78, and Page 91
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 129
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013