Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Vila

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1533²Born
27 Feb 159764.1AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
6 Jul 159764.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
24 Sep 159764.7DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Vila
Bishop Juan Vila (born 1533, died ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervera, Diocese of Vic
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona
Death PlaceCervera, Diocese of Vic

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,844
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 109, Number 693
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018