Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Jaime

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1569Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 1587AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
8 Nov 1587Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
9 Dec 1596AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
29 Jan 1601DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Jaime
Bishop Pedro Jaime (died ) Bishop of Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParacuellos de Jiloca, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopLa Seo, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100, and Page 333
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,735
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 99, Number 621
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast