Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Moncada

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹Born
22 Mar 161045.2AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
16 May 161045.4Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
30 Jul 161247.6AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
3 Nov 162257.8DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Moncada:
Archbishop Juan de Moncada (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 110, and Page 328
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 126, Number 804

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 28 Dec 2013