Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Trejo de Sande Paniagua, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹Born
9 Jul 161839.5AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
16 Sep 161839.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
21 Dec 163657.9DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Antonio Trejo de Sande Paniagua
Bishop Antonio Trejo de Sande Paniagua O.F.M.
(born 1579, died )
Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlasencia

Relatives
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,205
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 136
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 136, Number 872
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 21
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025