Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Vélez de Valdivielso

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹BornHoz
9 Jun 163655.4AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
28 Sep 163655.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
25 Feb 164160.1AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
21 Aug 164564.6AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
1 Jul 164867.5DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Vélez de Valdivielso:
Bishop Juan Vélez de Valdivielso (died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 65, and Page 136
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 163, Number 1,026

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014