Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis García Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Sep 1604Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 1634AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
21 Sep 1634Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
9 Feb 1637AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
18 Apr 1638DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis García Rodríguez
Bishop Luis García Rodríguez (died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanizo
Ordained BishopIncarnation, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 98, and Page 103
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 161, Number 1,013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,049

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 28 Aug 2020

Quantcast