Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Sánchez Villanueva y Vega

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1581³BornMadrid
10 Aug 162746.6SelectedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
24 Jan 162847.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
23 Sep 163049.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
9 Jul 163554.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
1651¹70.0ResignedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
4 Feb 165877.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Sánchez Villanueva y Vega:
Archbishop Francisco Sánchez Villanueva y Vega (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 327, and Page 132
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 151, Number 959
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015