Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso de Franco y Luna

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572BornAlcalá de Henares, Spain
7 Jun 163260.4AppointedBishop of Durango, México
31 Oct 163260.8Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
30 May 163967.4AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
164573.0DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Alonso de Franco y Luna:
Bishop Alonso de Franco y Luna Bishop of La Paz

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013