Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóforo Chrisostome Carletti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Termia (Thermae), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1564Born
23 May 162258.1AppointedBishop of Termia (Thermae), Greece
29 May 162258.1Ordained BishopBishop of Termia (Thermae), Greece
1624²59.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
1627²62.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
1634²69.7ResignedBishop of Termia (Thermae), Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóforo Chrisostome Carletti
Bishop Cristóforo Chrisostome Carletti O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Termia (Thermae)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapranica

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 333
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 76, Number 448
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 141, Number 901
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018