Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Barahona Zapata del Águila

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1578³BornMadrid, Spain
3 Dec 163153.1SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
29 Mar 163253.4ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
28 Oct 163254.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
19 Nov 163254.1DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Barahona Zapata del Águila:
Bishop Juan Barahona Zapata del Águila (died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 258
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 156, Number 988

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015