Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Pedrosa Casares, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1571BornValladolid
4 Jul 162453.0SelectedBishop of León, Spain
16 Sep 162453.2ConfirmedBishop of León, Spain
29 Dec 162453.5Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
31 Jan 163361.6AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
1645²73.5ResignedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Pedrosa Casares:
Bishop Gregorio Pedrosa Casares O.S.H. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Valladolid

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,397
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,499
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 218, and Page 358
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 147, Number 933
  • c4: CB, 18 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014