Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bravo Lagunas, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ugento


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Jan 1616AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
17 Jan 1616Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
1627²ResignedBishop of Ugento, Italy
20 Nov 1634DiedBishop Emeritus of Ugento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bravo Lagunas:
Bishop Juan Bravo Lagunas O.S.A. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ugento

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 351
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 59, Number 339
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 132, Number 845

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014