Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Pereda Gudiel

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1578Born
9 Aug 162749.2AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
14 Nov 162749.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
25 May 163253.9DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Pereda Gudiel
Bishop Juan Pereda Gudiel (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePliego

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,837
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 150, Number 952
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast