Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardo Cardinal de Rojas y Sandoval

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1546Born
8 Jan 158639.7AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
20 Apr 158640.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
16 Mar 158841.9AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
29 Apr 159650.0AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
3 Mar 159952.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 159952.9AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
26 Feb 160154.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
7 Dec 161872.6DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Rojas y Sandoval (VIAF: 30648365)
Bernardo Cardinal de Rojas y Sandoval (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAranda de Duero, Diocese of Osma
Ordained BishopSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Buried Place (Original)Sagrario chapel, Cathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 32.6 years
  • a cardinal for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,998
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 97, Number 611
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168, and Page 268
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203, and Page 315
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018