Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro González de Mendoza, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1571BornMadrid
19 Jul 161039.4AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
29 Aug 161039.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Granada, Spain
8 Feb 161644.9AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
2 Oct 162352.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Sigüenza, Spain
23 Jul 163968.4DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro González de Mendoza:
Archbishop Pedro González de Mendoza O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126, and Page 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 126, Number 807

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015