Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino de Sena (Senis; Senna), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1571Born
8 Aug 163059.2SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
16 Dec 163059.6ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
13 Jul 163160.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
5 Oct 163261.4DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Bernardino de Sena (Senis; Senna):
Bishop Bernardino de Sena (Senis; Senna) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,633
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013