Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Singapore

Archidioecesis Singaporensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • William Goh Seng Chye, Archbishop
  • Nicholas Chia Yeck Joo, Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 18 December 1972
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Singapore
  • Square Kilometers: 639 (246 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.veritas.org.sg/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 31 Victoria Street, Singapore 187 997
  • Telephone: 6339.6715
  • Fax: 6333.4735

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Malacca
4 February 1558ErectedDiocese of Malacca (erected)
23 January 1576Territory LostDiocese of Malacca Diocese of Macau (erected)
1712Territory LostDiocese of Malacca Prefecture Apostolic of Islands of the Indian Ocean (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore
10 September 1841Name ChangedDiocese of Malacca Vicariate Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore
Diocese of Malacca
10 August 1888ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore Diocese of Malacca
Archdiocese of Malacca
19 September 1953ElevatedDiocese of Malacca Archdiocese of Malacca
25 February 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Malacca Diocese of Kuala Lumpur (erected)
25 February 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Malacca Diocese of Penang (erected)
Archdiocese of Malacca-Singapore
25 February 1955Name ChangedArchdiocese of Malacca Archdiocese of Malacca-Singapore
18 December 1972SplitArchdiocese of Malacca-Singapore Diocese of Malacca-Johor
Archdiocese of Singapore
Archdiocese of Singapore
18 December 1972SplitArchdiocese of Malacca-Singapore Diocese of Malacca-Johor
Archdiocese of Singapore

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Malacca
195095,6246,242,0021.5%367432,22312442038ap1951
Archdiocese of Malacca
Archdiocese of Malacca-Singapore
196993,5003,664,9002.6%743110589010925934ap1971
Archdiocese of Singapore
198085,3802,400,0003.6%5931909488524624ap1981
1990108,6012,650,0004.1%754411991211024129ap1991
1999143,6683,865,6003.7%76501261,14011021130ap2000
2000147,4213,893,7003.8%76641401,05312124830ap2001
2001151,6554,017,7003.8%67591261,20311221630ap2002
2002155,5374,131,2003.8%69611301,19611922030ap2003
2003159,1324,163,7003.8%68621301,22413524930ap2004
2004162,7114,185,2003.9%70671371,18713220230ap2005
2010185,2084,990,0003.7%71601311,41317121031ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 29 May 2013