Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Émile Marie Luc Alphonse Barillon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malacca

Titular Bishop of Thaumacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1860BornLumeau, France
20 Sep 188423.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 May 190443.6AppointedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
18 Sep 190443.9Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
10 Jan 193372.2ResignedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
10 Jan 193372.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
27 Jul 193574.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Malacca, Singapore

MicroData Summary for Émile Marie Luc Alphonse Barillon:
Bishop Émile Marie Luc Alphonse Barillon M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malacca

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • tbis: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013