Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Adolphe Gandy, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Pondicherry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1839BornChâtonnay, France
13 Jul 186223.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
16 Mar 188344.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Pondicherry, India
16 Mar 188344.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricale
9 Sep 188344.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricale
15 Jan 188949.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Pondicherry, India
15 Jan 188949.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
29 Sep 189253.6SucceededArchbishop of Pondicherry, India
26 Mar 190970.1DiedArchbishop of Pondicherry, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Adolphe Gandy:
Archbishop Joseph-Adolphe Gandy M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Pondicherry

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 209, and Page 462
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 564

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013