Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Antonio Roviglia, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Malabar

Titular Bishop of Sura

Titular See: (Raimondo di San Giuseppe)(Côte Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1752BornMombaruzzo
9 Sep 177220.4ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
6 Mar 180350.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
6 Mar 180350.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
3 Jan 180855.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
18 Aug 181563.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
7 Jul 181664.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Malabar, India

MicroData Summary for Paolo Antonio Roviglia:
Bishop Paolo Antonio Roviglia O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Malabar

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013