Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

Archidioecesis Angelorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 August 1903
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Puebla
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 20,932 (8,084 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Oriente
  • Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesispuebla.org.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 235, Av. 2 Sur N. 305, 72000 Puebla, Pue., México
  • Telephone: (2)2324-591
  • Fax: 2462-277

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
13 October 1525ErectedDiocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles) (erected)
2 September 1530Territory LostDiocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles) Diocese of México (erected)
21 June 1535Territory LostDiocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles) Diocese of Antequera, Oaxaca (erected)
12 February 1546Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles) (From Seville (Spain) to Mexico (Mexico))
16 March 1863Territory LostArchdiocese of Michoacán
Archdiocese of México
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Diocese of Chilapa (erected)
19 March 1863Territory LostDiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Diocese of Veracruz-Jalapa (erected)
12 March 1870Territory LostArchdiocese of México
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tamaulipas
Diocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas (erected)
25 April 1902Territory LostArchdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Diocese of Mixtecas (erected)
Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla
11 August 1903ElevatedDiocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles) Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla (Name Changed and Diocese raised to an Archdiocese)
23 May 1959Territory LostArchdiocese of México
Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla
Diocese of Tlaxcala (erected)
13 January 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla
Diocese of Tehuacán (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla
19501,470,0001,500,00098.0%286663524,17690901173ap1951
19661,709,8001,724,84699.1%2971144114,160145ap1967
19681,796,2171,838,76797.7%2812505313,382281900142ap1971
19761,962,7742,038,66896.3%292983905,0321321,032158ap1977
19802,210,5122,289,94296.5%3031094125,365174998173ap1981
19902,855,7943,173,10590.0%330894196,81523301,136201ap1991
19994,702,2644,930,52995.4%3941175119,20212291,033204ap2000
20004,585,3024,967,82592.3%4041205248,7502481,039234ap2001
20014,709,1065,101,95792.3%3951335288,9182461,190242ap2002
20023,567,4893,809,38593.6%4071005077,0362101,206243ap2003
20033,971,0654,291,65392.5%4041095137,7401991,097245ap2004
20044,054,8564,382,20792.5%4071215287,67922201,100207ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014