Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Juan de Palafox y Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1600BornFitero, Spain
Apr 1629³28.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 163939.3AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
27 Dec 163939.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
28 Jun 164040.0InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
16 Aug 165353.1SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
23 Nov 165353.4ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
1 Oct 165959.3DiedBishop of Osma, Spain
5 Jun 2011Beatified

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Juan de Palafox y Mendoza:
Bishop Bl. Juan de Palafox y Mendoza (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 268, and Page 338
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 167, Number 1,048

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014