Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Diego Díaz de Quintanilla y de Hevía y Valdés, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1587BornOviedo
8 Aug 163951.8AppointedBishop of Durango, México
8 Jan 164052.2Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
14 May 165567.6AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
6 Dec 165669.1DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Diego Díaz de Quintanilla y de Hevía y Valdés: VIAF:73701417
Bishop Francisco Diego Díaz de Quintanilla y de Hevía y Valdés O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,414
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85, and Page 178
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 168, Number 1,054
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015