Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Durango

Archidioecesis Durangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 23 June 1891
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Durango
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 109,422 (42,264 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Vizcaya-Pacifico
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado Postal 116, 20 de Noviembre 306 Poniente, 34000 Durango, Dgo., México
  • Telephone: (618)811-42-42
  • Fax: 812-88-81

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Durango
28 September 1620ErectedDiocese of Guadalajara Diocese of Durango (erected)
7 May 1779Territory LostDiocese of Durango Diocese of Sonora (erected)
18 July 1826Territory LostDiocese of Durango
Diocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans)
Diocese of Saint Louis (erected)
1850Territory LostDiocese of Durango Vicariate Apostolic of New Mexico (erected)
23 June 1891Territory LostDiocese of Durango Diocese of Chihuahua (erected)
Archdiocese of Durango
23 June 1891ElevatedDiocese of Durango Archdiocese of Durango
22 November 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of Durango
Diocese of Sinaloa
Diocese of Mazatlán (erected)
13 January 1962Territory LostDiocese of Colima
Archdiocese of Durango
Diocese of Zacatecas
Territorial Prelature of Jesús María (del Nayar) (erected)
10 June 1968Territory LostArchdiocese of Durango
Diocese of Mazatlán
Territorial Prelature of El Salto (erected)
25 November 2008Territory LostArchdiocese of Durango Diocese of Gómez Palacio (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Durango
1950583,000600,00097.2%909995,8882216252ap1951
1966840,000855,32098.2%117101276,6144430655ap1967
1968826,501852,06297.0%131121435,7794331353ap1971
1976995,9001,041,27295.6%138141526,5511441068ap1977
19801,226,0901,262,86497.1%1361369,0151539875ap1981
19901,367,0481,424,00896.0%160161767,7672944888ap1991
19991,671,0321,816,34092.0%204192237,49346420105ap2000
20001,838,1361,997,97492.0%201192208,35546387105ap2001
20012,157,8122,197,77198.2%199192189,89846387105ap2003
20031,564,0001,700,00092.0%199172167,24041400102ap2004
20041,564,0001,700,00092.0%196172137,34241400102ap2005
20061,642,2001,785,00092.0%206182247,33138434105ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Sep 2014