Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín de Elizacoechea

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1679¹BornAzpilcueta, Spain
28 Mar 173556.2SelectedBishop of Durango, México
27 Jul 173556.5ConfirmedBishop of Durango, México
6 May 173657.3Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
11 Jan 174566.0SelectedBishop of Michoacán, México
8 Mar 174566.1ConfirmedBishop of Michoacán, México
11 Nov 174566.8InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
19 Nov 175677.8DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín de Elizacoechea:
Bishop Martín de Elizacoechea (born 1679, died ) Bishop of Michoacán

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202, and Page 283
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,519
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 54, Number 235
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015