Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Manuel Cardinal Fernández de Portocarrero-Bocanegra y Moscoso-Osorio

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1635BornPalma del Río
5 Aug 166934.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
29 Nov 166934.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 May 167035.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
20 Dec 167742.9AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
16 Jan 167843.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
27 Jan 169863.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
14 Sep 170974.6DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Manuel Fernández de Portocarrero-Bocanegra y Moscoso-Osorio:
Luis Manuel Cardinal Fernández de Portocarrero-Bocanegra y Moscoso-Osorio (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
  • a cardinal for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Aug 1669
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 217, Number 1,350
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015