Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé de Ocampo y Mata

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640BornMadrid
8 Nov 169454.9AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
30 Jan 169555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
1 Jun 169959.4AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
22 Sep 170363.7DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé de Ocampo y Mata:
Bishop Bartolomé de Ocampo y Mata (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 316, and Page 350
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 237, Number 1,469

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013