Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Zapata Vera y Morales

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹Born
11 Mar 168032.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
11 Mar 168032.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dara
23 Apr 170355.3AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
14 Jan 172072.0DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Zapata Vera y Morales
Bishop Francisco Zapata Vera y Morales (born 1648, died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 182, and Page 422
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 220, Number 1,368
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018