Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Solórzano Castillo

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640²BornMadrid
10 May 170060.3AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
27 Jun 170060.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
17 Jul 170363.5DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Solórzano Castillo:
Bishop Gregorio Solórzano Castillo (born 1640, died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 20, Number 5
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015