Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jaime de Palafox y Cardona

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1642BornZaragoza, Spain
8 Nov 167734.9AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
11 Nov 167734.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
13 Nov 168441.9AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
3 Dec 170159.0DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaime de Palafox y Cardona:
Archbishop Jaime de Palafox y Cardona (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 222, and Page 305
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 217, Number 1,347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013