Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto Cappelletti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1618³BornRieti
14 Sep 165941.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 165941.6AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
2 Nov 165941.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
27 Jan 167556.9ResignedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
21 Jan 168162.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Cappelletti:
Archbishop Benedetto Cappelletti (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia

  • a priest for 21.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 740
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 317
  • r/d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013