Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Mosti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Spain

Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635¹BornFerrare, Italy
16 Dec 167540.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
20 Feb 167641.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
25 Feb 167641.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
12 Feb 169055.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
22 May 169055.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
29 Jul 169257.5DiedApostolic Nuncio to Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mosti
Archbishop Giuseppe Mosti (born 1635, died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Spain

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 2
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Nov 2016