Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Hyacinthe Valperga di Masino

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1656BornTorino
21 Sep 168630.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 168731.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
31 Aug 168731.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
7 Sep 173680.4DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for François Hyacinthe Valperga di Masino:
Bishop François Hyacinthe Valperga di Masino (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 261
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Sep 2014