Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurizio Bertone, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1639Born
28 Mar 167838.8AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
12 Apr 167838.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
27 Nov 170162.5DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Bertone
Bishop Maurizio Bertone C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChieri

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 205
  • c3: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018