Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Mayers Caramuel, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1617Born
27 Apr 167658.8AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
10 May 167658.9Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
18 Apr 167860.8AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
28 Feb 168365.7DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Mayers Caramuel
Bishop Lorenzo Mayers Caramuel O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 135, and Page 149
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 213, Number 1,331
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1676, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018