Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio del Río Colmenares

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1623BornArnedo, Spain
3 Jul 165632.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 167652.7AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
10 May 167652.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
14 Mar 167854.6AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
Apr 1702³78.6DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio del Río Colmenares:
Archbishop Antonio del Río Colmenares (born ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 214, Number 1,332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013