Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Acerenza

Archidioecesis Acheruntina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francesco Sirufo, Archbishop
  • Michele Scandiffio, Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Acerenza
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Acerenza (erected)
Archdiocese of Acerenza
11th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Acerenza Archdiocese of Acerenza
Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
7 May 1203UnitedArchdiocese of Acerenza
Archdiocese of Matera
Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
Archdiocese of Acerenza (e Matera)
27 June 1818Name ChangedArchdiocese of Acerenza e Matera Archdiocese of Acerenza (e Matera)
Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
9 November 1822Name ChangedArchdiocese of Acerenza (e Matera) Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
Archdiocese of Acerenza
2 July 1954SplitArchdiocese of Acerenza e Matera Archdiocese of Acerenza
Archdiocese of Matera
Diocese of Acerenza
21 August 1976ElevatedArchdiocese of Acerenza Diocese of Acerenza (Archdiocese to Diocese)
Archdiocese of Acerenza
3 December 1977ElevatedDiocese of Acerenza Archdiocese of Acerenza

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
1886144,141.0%452033OTC
1950168,932169,27199.8%93101031,640914038ap1951
Archdiocese of Acerenza
195969,43869,50899.9%444481,44668620ap1960
196960,09860,37499.5%313341,76748122ap1971
Diocese of Acerenza
Archdiocese of Acerenza
198059,80060,71898.5%356411,45876821ap1981
199061,00062,50097.6%396451,35587321ap1991
199960,15060,30099.8%376431,39866121ap2000
200060,15060,30099.8%388461,30786221ap2001
200159,95060,10099.8%376431,39466321ap2002
200259,95060,12099.7%386441,36266221ap2003
200360,00060,20099.7%375421,42856221ap2004
200460,00060,20099.7%352371,62125821ap2005
200553,00055,00096.4%362381,39425721ap2006
200653,00053,21599.6%402421,26126721ap2007
201142,38242,81599.0%382401,05926121ap2012
201242,60043,00099.1%393421,01436021ap2013
201540,36840,59599.4%3934296165021ap2016
201840,49040,65099.6%39391,03814521ap2019

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Acerenza
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 70
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 843
  • Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 70
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 79
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 94
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 67
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 67
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 64
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 57
  • Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 72
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 35
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
    Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 13 Oct 2021

    Quantcast