Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabrizio Antinori

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
10 Jan 162241.0AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
16 Jan 162241.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
13 Nov 163049.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Siracusa, Italy
25 Jul 163554.5DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Antinori
Archbishop Fabrizio Antinori (born 1581, died ) Bishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 67, and Page 325
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 74, Number 433
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,622, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast