Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Michele Onorati

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1823Born
4 Mar 184724.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Sep 187956.6AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
28 Sep 187956.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
12 Feb 190380.0DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Michele Onorati
Bishop Angelo Michele Onorati (born , died ) Bishop of Tricarico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiglionico, Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 565
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,879, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast