Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius IX

Bl. Giovanni Maria Mastai-Ferretti

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1792BornSenigallia, Italy
10 Apr 181926.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 182735.0AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
3 Jun 182735.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
17 Dec 183240.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Imola, Italy
23 Dec 183947.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
14 Dec 184048.6Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 184048.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
16 Jun 184654.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
21 Jun 184654.1InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
21 Sep 184654.4ResignedBishop of Imola, Italy
7 Feb 187885.7DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Sep 2000Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Giovanni Maria Mastai-Ferretti:
Pope Bl. Giovanni Maria Mastai-Ferretti (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 50.7 years
  • a cardinal for 6.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 223, and Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Nov 2014