Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Flavio Cardinal Chigi

Deceased

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1810Born
17 Dec 185343.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 185646.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
6 Jul 185646.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
24 Apr 185746.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
1 Oct 186151.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
22 Dec 187363.5Elevated to Cardinal
1874¹63.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
15 Jun 187464.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
24 Dec 187666.5AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
15 Feb 188574.7DiedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Flavio Chigi (VIAF: 1710)
Flavio Cardinal Chigi (born , died ) Archpriest of Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy, Italy
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace of the Quirinale, Pauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
  • a cardinal for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 398, and Page 50
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 24
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1873

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017