Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Macioti

Deceased

Official of the Congregation of the Holy Office

Titular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1798Born
21 Apr 182122.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 184547.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
5 Oct 184547.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
21 Oct 184547.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
11 Apr 185657.6AppointedOfficial of the Congregation of the Holy Office
18 Jan 185960.3DiedOfficial of the Congregation of the Holy Office

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Macioti (VIAF: 315966416)
Archbishop Alessandro Macioti (born , died ) Official of Holy Office

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelletri
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 42
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast