Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Etienne Marilley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne et Genève

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1804BornChâtel-St-Denis
28 May 183126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
16 Dec 184541.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
16 Dec 184541.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
19 Jan 184641.2AppointedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
15 Mar 184641.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
17 Nov 187975.1RetiredBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
9 Aug 188378.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
17 Jan 188984.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Etienne Marilley:
Archbishop Etienne Marilley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne et Genève

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 398
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 233, and Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013