Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Marie Magnin

Deceased

Bishop of Annecy, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1802Born
20 May 182623.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 186058.0SelectedBishop of Annecy, France
18 Mar 186158.3ConfirmedBishop of Annecy, France
11 Jun 186158.5Ordained BishopBishop of Annecy, France
14 Jan 187976.1DiedBishop of Annecy, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Marie Magnin (VIAF: 34451339)
Bishop Claude-Marie Magnin (born , died ) Bishop of Annecy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Muraz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Annecy, Diocese of Annecy

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017