Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alexis Cardinal Billiet

Deceased

Archbishop of Chambéry

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1783BornLes Chapelles
23 May 180724.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 182542.7SelectedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
19 Dec 182542.8ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
19 Mar 182643.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
18 Mar 184057.1SelectedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
27 Apr 184057.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
27 Sep 186178.6Elevated to Cardinal
25 Sep 186279.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
30 Apr 187390.2DiedArchbishop of Chambéry, France

MicroData Summary for Alexis Billiet:
Cardinal Alexis Billiet (born , died ) Archbishop of Chambéry

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
  • a cardinal for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 47
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 148, and Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013